EAST WICKHAM AND WELLING WAR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant giving charity and offering the following categories of grants to individuals or community based organisations within the boundaries of East Wickham and Welling: Capital Grants for Improvements to Premises, Grants Towards the Hire of Premises and Individual Grants for Character Building Courses or Expeditions. The Trustees also offer an academic bursary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 27 August 1969: Standard registration
- EAST WICKHAM TRUST (Working name)
- WAR MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
- EAST WICKHAM AND WELLING WAR MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WARREN DOUGLAS FOOT | Chair | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Haylett Easton JP DL | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAHENY | Trustee | 15 December 1997 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY DARRELL WATKINS | Trustee | 13 December 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.31k | £37.73k | £27.69k | £25.31k | £20.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.80k | £32.97k | £47.34k | £46.54k | £55.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1930, AND SCHEME OF THE COMMISIONERS OF THE 5TH MAY 1995
Charitable objects
(1) UPKEEP OF THE PARISH WAR MEMORIAL OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MICHAEL, EAST WICKHAM (2) IN FURTHERING THE WORK OF ANY CHARITY THE OBJECTS OF WHICH INCLUDE (A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN EAST WICKHAM (B) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN EAST WICKHAM OR WELLING (FOR FURHTER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 5 OF SCHEME)
Area of benefit
EAST WICKHAM AND WELLING
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 628
WELLING
KENT
DA16 2TF
- Phone:
- 01
- Email:
- admin@ewt.org.uk
- Website:
-
ewt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window