THE LISTER INSTITUTE OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE

Charity Number: 206271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charitable objectives of the Institute are to further understanding and progress in preventive medicine by promoting biomedical excellence in the UK and the Republic of Ireland through its support of the biological sciences and to ensure long-term public benefit through publication of the knowledge gained and, where appropriate, by encouraging its exploitation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LISTER INSTITUTE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Muzlifah Haniffa Trustee 13 September 2024
None on record
Jennifer Smithson Trustee 08 September 2023
None on record
Professor John Julian Blow Trustee 10 September 2022
None on record
Professor Rosalind Louise Smyth CBE Trustee 09 September 2022
MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES
Received: On time
THE HEALTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
murray john legg Trustee 04 September 2020
THE DOROTHY WHARTON (MEH) TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen McMahon Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record
Professor Pamela Jean Shaw DBE Trustee 07 September 2018
None on record
Professor Sir John Peter Iredale Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record
Dr Rebecca Clare Fitzgerald Trustee 04 September 2015
HEARTBURN CANCER UK
Received: On time
The Faraday Institute for Science and Religion
Received: On time
Professor Sir Adrian Peter Bird Trustee 04 September 2015
THE FRANCIS CRICK INSTITUTE LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR DOUGLAS HIGGS Trustee 17 August 2012
None on record
PROFESSOR ALEC JOHN JEFFREYS FRS Trustee
None on record
HONORABLE RORY MICHAEL BENJAMIN GUINNESS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £846.00k £593.00k £612.00k £595.00k £679.00k
Total expenditure £1.78m £1.39m £1.97m £2.49m £2.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £840.00k £580.00k £612.00k £595.00k £679.00k
Income - Other £6.00k £13.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.15m £1.71m £2.31m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £245.00k £237.00k £263.00k £185.00k £167.00k
Expenditure - Governance £36.00k £27.00k £29.00k £36.00k £40.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.33m £888.00k £1.53m £2.08m £1.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £245.00k £237.00k £263.00k £185.00k £167.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £43.23m £44.86m £47.60m £43.29m £43.10m
Other assets £311.00k £158.00k £288.00k £173.00k £254.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£143.00k -£134.00k -£134.00k -£142.00k -£141.00k
Total liabilities £73.00k £88.00k £73.00k £50.00k £66.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 2502
WATFORD
WD18 1AE
Phone:
0203 5325345