ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH

Charity number: 206296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Branches principal activity is the care and protection of all animals who have been sick, maltreated or neglected predominately within the East Norfolk branch area. The Branch operates an animal welfare clinic as part of its. We also operate a voucher system for helping towards neutering costs or veterinary expenses for people who are in receipt of means tested benefits.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £395,000
Total expenditure: £393,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA EAST NORFOLK BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA EAST NORFOLK BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA GREAT YARMOUTH AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sid Brown Trustee 10 September 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Fiona Miles Trustee 18 June 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dawn Applegate Trustee 13 February 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Jade Martin Trustee 28 April 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Linda Holland Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
Jillian Brenkley Trustee 26 March 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £304.72k £270.67k £314.99k £299.94k £395.00k
Total expenditure £299.16k £280.33k £270.56k £276.56k £393.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.00k £51.75k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R S P C A
Tarworks Road
Great Yarmouth
NR30 1QR
Phone:
07927000466