RAILWAY BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 206312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The RBF is the working name used by the Railway Benevolent Institution and exists to help both active and retired railway people in need through the provision of financial grants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £415,501
Total expenditure: £839,669

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 1964: Standard registration
  • 28 May 1997: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 28 May 1997: Funds transferred to
  • 28 July 2011: Funds received from
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAILWAY BENEFIT FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Horne Chair 13 September 2024
None on record
Stuart Mackcracken Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Fiona Irvine Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Samantha Turner Trustee 29 August 2024
None on record
Faye Rebecca Scadden Trustee 13 September 2023
None on record
Michael Joseph Cash Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Emma Wasley Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Margaret Joyce Simpson Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Ciaran Thomas Barr Trustee 29 November 2017
STUDIO WAYNE MCGREGOR LIMITED
Received: On time
Paula Jane Hayes Trustee 26 June 2016
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Goodland Trustee 09 October 2013
BEDFORD & MILTON KEYNES WATERWAY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £388.86k £330.36k £404.64k £583.03k £415.50k
Total expenditure £613.42k £530.92k £633.46k £826.45k £839.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £357.84k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £125.56k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £99.63k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £13.37k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £645.44k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £181.02k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £37.22k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £27.88k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 8TH MAY 1942
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED AND NECESSITOUS EMPLOYEES OF THE SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, WITH PREFERENCE FOR THOSE EMPLOYEES WHO HAVE WORKED OR ARE WORKING ON THAT PART OF THE SOUTHERN RAILWAY WHICH FOMERLY CONSTITUTED THE UNDERTAKING OF THE SOUTH EASTERN RAILWAY COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 10 February 1964 : Standard registration
  • 28 May 1997 : Removed
  • 28 May 1997 : Asset transfer out
  • 28 July 2011 : Asset transfer in

Contact information

Address:
1st Floor
Millenium House
40 Nantwich Road
Crewe
Cheshire
CW2 6AD
Phone:
03452412885