TEDDY BEAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a grant making trust applying funds to charitable causes at the trustees discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- THE MATHILDA AND TERENCE KENNEDY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
john Henderson | Chair | 07 September 1992 |
|
|
||||
MR G M HULL | Trustee | 31 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
HON AMANDA JANE SIEFF | Trustee | 31 October 1997 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HENDERSON | Trustee | 07 September 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £2.00k | £900 | £1.80k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 February 2023 | 443 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 February 2023 | 808 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 29 MARCH 1956, AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PAY THE INCOME AND THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charities Aid Foundation
25 Kings Hill Avenue
Kings Hill
WEST MALLING
Kent
ME19 4TA
- Phone:
- 03000123000
- Email:
- enquires@cafonline.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window