THE SAINT SAVIOUR'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD COTTAGE HOUSING ASSOCIATION | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.42k | £59.62k | £59.62k | £62.68k | £65.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.27k | £30.22k | £30.22k | £36.42k | £57.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2023 | 378 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2023 | 743 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2023 | 743 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25/01/1935 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/05/1958 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 14/02/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE AND COMMINICANTS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 27 OF 1935 SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY SAVIOUR, HITCHIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pioneer House
Norton Way South
Letchworth Garden City
SG6 1NY
- Phone:
- 01462683307
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window