THE ABBEYFIELD CANVEY ISLAND SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 206449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Residential Home for Elderly People

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £182,768
Total expenditure: £179,279

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ABBEYFIELD (CANVEY ISLAND) SOCIETY (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Stanley Hampson Chair 24 September 2021
None on record
Clive Pitts Trustee 24 August 2023
None on record
Terence Victor Box Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Gillian Fieldwick Trustee 09 November 2018
None on record
MARIANNE MORGAN Trustee
None on record
DOREEN BAMBRIDGE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £136.62k £121.24k £114.75k £132.35k £182.77k
Total expenditure £166.06k £150.35k £145.60k £163.04k £179.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
103 LONG ROAD
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 0JB
Phone:
01268695875
Website:

No information available