THE MARY DACOMBE HOMES OF REST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sheltered accommodation within an almshouse charity for persons over the age of 60 whether male or female who have a financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 31 August 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID HUGH RICHARDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN ELLSON | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
JANE BEVERLEY HANNIFAN | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|||||
MR WILLIAM JOHN ARMSTRONG DACOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.48k | £20.47k | £19.32k | £20.65k | £21.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.30k | £21.53k | £17.20k | £22.75k | £25.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 22ND 1931 AND SCHEME OF THE 5TH JUNE 1967
Charitable objects
HOMES OF REST FOR AGED OR SICK OR POOR PERSONS IN THE DISTRICTS OF BOURNEMOUTH AND CHRISTCHURCH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE WIDOWS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE BUILDING TRADE, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PAINTERS AND THEIR WIDOWS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH, CHRISTCHURCH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BOURNEWOOD DRIVE
BOURNEMOUTH
BH4 9JP
- Phone:
- 01202766838
- Email:
- jdavidhrichardson4@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window