Accounts and annual returns BELSTEAD CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 206484
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 13 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 December 2019 Not Required