Financial history BELSTEAD CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 206484
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/12/2017 13/12/2018 13/12/2019 13/12/2020 13/12/2021
Total gross income £38 £38 £39 £40 £35
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A