THE INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR STRATEGIC STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IISS aims to provide, from an international perspective, the best objective information on military and political developments and to assist in conflict resolution through the conduct of dialogues and conferences, research and publications. Its mission is to promote the adoption of sound policies to further global peace and security and maintain civilised international relations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£25,030,000
Donations and legacies | £3.05m | |
Charitable activities | £20.98m | |
Other trading activities | £515.00k | |
Investments | £343.00k | |
Other | £140.00k |
Total expenditure:
£25,239,000
Raising funds | £86.00k | |
Charitable activities | £24.79m | |
Other | £359.00k |
-£110,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £753,416 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £445.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.79m |
People

163 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 7 |
£90k to £100k | 8 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 5 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 4 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 3 |
Over �500k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- Bahrain
- Germany
- India
- Singapore
- United States
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- I I S S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL EMMOTT | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Symonds | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lord Mark Sedwill | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kasper Rorsted | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Parly | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hakeem Belo-Osagie | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Brennan | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neha Aviral | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Grace Skaugen | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Atkinson | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chung Min Lee | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Symonds | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.67m | £17.02m | £18.40m | £24.54m | £25.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.62m | £16.61m | £17.58m | £23.96m | £25.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.17k | £33.23k | N/A | £83.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £705.94k | £870.90k | £611.37k | £1.25m | £753.42k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.04m | £2.94m | £2.81m | £2.95m | £3.05m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £527.04k | £395.80k | £267.62k | £346.39k | £515.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.73m | £13.40m | £15.00m | £20.90m | £20.98m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £5.97m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £99.04k | £256.81k | £294.67k | £315.77k | £343.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £148.23k | £25.16k | £24.54k | £26.45k | £140.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £17.90m | £16.07m | £17.23m | £23.69m | £24.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £200.68k | £138.23k | £153.34k | £262.17k | £86.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £110.50k | £76.00k | £77.00k | £116.00k | £198.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.86k | £24.98k | £37.67k | £37.51k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £516.05k | £396.23k | £198.00k | £0 | £359.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.69m | £13.65m | £14.01m | £14.12m | £13.72m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.50m | £10.32m | £11.43m | £10.52m | £10.23m | |
|
Other assets | £6.34m | £8.27m | £9.24m | £10.04m | £11.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£716.06k | -£739.06k | -£556.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.10m | £7.52m | £8.06m | £7.91m | £9.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12TH AUGUST 1971, 14TH JULY 1987, 15TH JULY 1992, 10TH SEPTEMBER 1994 AND 19TH FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 02 May 2019
Charitable objects
A)TO PROMOTE ON A NON-PARTY BASIS THE STUDY AND DISCUSSION OF AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION UPON ANY MAJOR INTERNATIONAL SECURITY ISSUES INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THOSE OF A POLITICAL, STRATEGIC, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ECOLOGICAL NATURE B) TO PROMOTE CONFLICT RESOLUTION BY FACILITATING DISCUSSION & DIALOGUE & PUBLISHING ANALYSIS ON MAJOR INTERNATIONAL SECURITY ISSUES TO ASSIST & PROMOTE THE RESOLUTION OF CONFLICTS BETWEEN OR WITHIN NATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARUNDEL HOUSE
6 TEMPLE PLACE
LONDON
WC2R 2PG
- Phone:
- 02073797676
- Email:
- accounts@iiss.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window