COMMON PASTURE (EXCLUSIVE OF THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity Number: 206513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Individual beneficiaries must reside in the parish of Clare. Organisations that are beneficiaries must carry out their operations in the parish of Clare.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £37,236
Total expenditure: £21,625

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL ROBERT PARTRIDGE Chair 04 April 2011
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ANNIE JONES Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
CAROLINE ANNE VANDER MEERSCH Trustee 20 February 2024
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Christine Little Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Fiona Cowie Trustee 19 September 2023
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Charles Swan Trustee 19 September 2023
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sarah Ruth Walters Trustee 20 September 2022
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Mark Jason Woodrow Trustee 01 April 2021
CAVENDISH ENDOWED SCHOOL
Received: On time
HUNDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF THOMAS ROGERON
Received: On time
HUNDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alan Mayle Trustee 17 April 2018
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ANDY GILL Trustee
THE CLARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.43k £9.78k £11.83k £16.94k £37.24k
Total expenditure £7.18k £6.40k £13.28k £42.89k £21.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £5.41k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 16 DECEMBER 1924 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 29 NOVEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CLARE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CLARE
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD SCHOOL
CALLIS STREET
CLARE
SUDBURY
SUFFOLK
CO10 8PX
Phone:
01787738820
Website:

No information available