THE DONALDSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Releif of poverty and promotion of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLIOT DOMINIC HOWARD WRIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sacha Sarah Donaldson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KERRY GLYN-BRISTOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH AUGUST 1952
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION; PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, WOUNDED, INJURED, AGED, INFIRM AND FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY GENERALLY; AND ANY OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AND CHARITABLE IN THE LEGAL SENSE OF THAT WORD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 HADLEY ROAD
BARNET
EN5 5QS
- Phone:
- 07711720172
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window