THE MOULTON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Will endeavour to provide financial assistance (including fuel vouchers) and services to promote healthy living and well being for beneficiaries within the parish of Moulton - including parishioners in need. To carry out reparation works to the Church and bridge. In future the charity will consider the possibility of managing a scheme for the provision of affordable housing in Moulton parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- THE MOULTON CHARITY (Working name)
- MOULTON FUEL LAND CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE FUEL LAND (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Unwin | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tim James | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Christopher Childs | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
DOUGLAS JAMES | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rachel Joan Webb | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAULINE ANNE GARMSTON | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBERT SALTMARSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.59k | £10.48k | £6.07k | £6.25k | £6.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52k | £1.76k | £3.13k | £4.29k | £1.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15TH JUNE 1869 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 JAN 2020 as amended on 01 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: “THE CHARITY WILL CARRY OUT REPARATION WORKS TO THE CHURCH AND BRIDGE WILL ENDEAVOUR TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND VARIOUS SERVICES TO PROMOTE HEALTHY LIVING AND WELL-BEING AMONG BENEFICIARIES WITHIN THE PARISH OF MOULTON, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. BENEFICIARIES TO INCLUDE PARISHIONERS IN NEED. THE CHARITY WILL CONSIDER THE POSSIBILITY AND POTENTIAL OF MANAGING A SCHEME FOR THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING IN MOULTON.”
Area of benefit
MOULTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Dalham Road
Moulton
NEWMARKET
Suffolk
CB8 8SB
- Phone:
- 01638 750879
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window