WILLIAM MEDLAND'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 206541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of coals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £4
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Paul Hutchinson Chair 26 January 2020
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY
Received: On time
Marion Ann Catmull Trustee 06 April 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Anthony Phillip Hopwood Trustee 01 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
Christine Miles Trustee 01 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NEOTS WITH EYNESBURY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
MRS JACKY ISAAC Trustee
JOAN CROMWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM LUFF ANDERSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
WYE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MUSGRAVE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
C P ROWLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOSEPH EAYRE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WORKHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN DRYDEN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN HOLLANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
MONEY ADVICE ST NEOTS
Received: On time
EMMA J HIDE'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6 £6 £6 £0 £4
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 July 2024 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
Church Street
ST. NEOTS
Cambridgeshire
PE19 2BU
Phone:
01480471297
Website:

No information available