WOOD LIBRARY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 05 November 1962: Standard registration
- 17 September 2002: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 4TH MARCH 1897. DEED DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1900. WILL OF F.A.WOOD ESQ. DATED 29TH APRIL 1904 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION (CONCURRED WITH BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS UNDER S.75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 14/1/02)
Charitable objects
(A) REPAIRING THE VARIOUS BOOKS GIVINE BY F.A.WOOD TO THE BOROUGH OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE PUBLIC LIBRARIES ACT 1892. (B) PURCHASE OF NEW BOOKS FOR THE SAID PUBLIC LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
WESTON-SUPER-MARE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.