Financial history THE ANDOVER CHARITIES

Charity number: 206587
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £87.80k £81.34k £76.67k £104.33k £88.18k
Total expenditure £20.70k £100.62k £82.67k £84.94k £145.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A