Trustees THE ANDOVER CHARITIES
Charity number: 206587

Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Nick Lodge | Chair | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leech | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Hardstaff | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Franciszek Budzynski | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Burley | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA WOOLGROVE | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE TURNER | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NULTY | Trustee | 10 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.