ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION FUND

Charity number: 206593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To ensure that those who served in the R Norfolk Regiment and its successor Regiments and their dependents are provide with the support when through circumstances beyond their control they require assistance. Also to foster comradeship inspired through service by the activities of the Association, and pay due regard and respect to the traditions of the former Regiment and its lasting memorials

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,597
Total expenditure: £10,507

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • NORFOLK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAJOR TIMOTHY MICHAEL TREVOR POWER Trustee 04 July 2020
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark Alexander Nicholas Trustee 01 September 2018
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
FOOD AND FARMING DISCOVERY TRUST
Received: 118 days late
Holt Youth Project
Received: On time
LIEUTENANT COLONEL ANTHONY POWELL MBE Trustee 12 April 2010
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE WAYLAND PARTNERSHIP DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST. ANDREWS CHURCH AT LITTLE CRESSINGHAM
Received: On time
LT COL EDDIE THORNE MC Trustee
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT MUSEUM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.40k £5.39k £5.22k £6.04k £7.60k
Total expenditure £7.71k £7.20k £5.01k £8.15k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R NORFOLK REGIMENT
325 AYLSHAM ROAD
NORWICH
NR32AB
Phone:
01953 882225
Website:

No information available