Financial history SAMUEL LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 206611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.85m £1.80m £1.75m £1.94m £1.83m
Total expenditure £651.00k £839.00k £58.00k £163.00k £307.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £258.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.85m £1.80m £1.75m £1.94m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.83m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £651.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £839.00k £58.00k £163.00k £307.00k