Linked charities SAMUEL LEWIS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 206611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN P.R. ON THE 5TH DECEMBER 1929 AND SCHEMES OF THE 23RD MAY 1967 AND THE 23RD JUNE 1969 AND 25TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSE FOR POOR PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER PARISH OF SITTINGBOURNE AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF SITTINGBOURNE
Registration history
- 01 October 1963 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.