NABS
Charity number: 206615
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- 21 September 2000: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 September 2000: Funds transferred to 1070556 NABS
Organisation type:
Other names:
- NATIONAL ADVERTISING BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 25 SEPT. 1967 AND 18 SEPT. 1968
Charitable objects
RELIEVING DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN ADVERTISING AND ANY PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN DEPENDANT UPON ANY PERSON ENGAGED IN ADVERTISING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24 MARCH 1971
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR THE CONTINUITY OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN OF ONE OR MORE OF THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE NATIONAL ADVERTISING BENEVOLENT SOCIETY WHOSE PARENTS ARE UNABLE TO CONTINUE EDUCATING THE SAID CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 10 October 1963 : Standard registration
- 21 September 2000 : Removed
- 21 September 2000 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.