THE FINCHLEY CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Finchley Charities, established in 1488, administer 172 flats for older persons on three estates in the Finchley area. Applicants should be over 55, in housing need, have limited means and have lived in the London Borough of Barnet for at least five years. Financial assistance may be granted to individuals or organisations in relieving persons in the area of benefit in need or hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,254,217
Donations and legacies | £1.68k | |
Charitable activities | £1.93m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £319.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,980,021
Raising funds | £23.77k | |
Charitable activities | £1.87m | |
Other | £82.54k |
£214,954 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £106.32k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.87m | |
Retained for future use | £274.20k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £106.32k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.87m | |
Retained for future use | £489.15k |
People

13 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 02 August 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Merrin | Chair | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jules Bickers | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Welch | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gordon | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Claire Farrier | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Councillor Danny Rich | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinyere Ugwu | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Nigel Benjamin | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Morales | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leila Satar | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM OLD | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV PHILIP DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99m | £2.01m | £2.51m | £2.09m | £2.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58m | £1.65m | £2.10m | £2.07m | £1.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £550 | £60 | £49.02k | £720 | £1.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.63m | £1.72m | £2.11m | £1.78m | £1.93m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £355.93k | £287.24k | £350.47k | £309.17k | £319.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £48.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.56m | £1.63m | £2.07m | £2.04m | £1.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £23.72k | £21.96k | £30.59k | £23.45k | £23.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.55k | £5.94k | £6.10k | £6.00k | £6.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £11.97k | £21.55k | £20.33k | £14.66k | £14.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £23.72k | £21.96k | £30.59k | £23.45k | £23.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £241 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £82.54k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.90m | £12.71m | £12.76m | £12.95m | £12.94m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.22m | £6.69m | £7.46m | £6.67m | £7.03m | |
|
Other assets | £194.87k | £441.38k | £208.92k | £220.04k | £344.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.06m | £3.78m | £3.45m | £3.26m | £3.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 3 MARCH 2011 as amended on 16 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES, AND ALLOTMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT;AND 2)SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 3)RELIEF IN NEED FOR PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. 4)PAYMENTS TO PARISH CHURCHES SITUATED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF FINCHLEY.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF FINCHLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
41A WILMOT CLOSE
LONDON
N2 8HP
- Phone:
- 02083499167
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window