WORLD HORSE WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity exists to promote horse welfare. In UK through rehabilitation centres where horses can be returned to health ; Field Officers investigate welfare concerns and give advice. Overseas by working with communities and local bodies to provide equine and other skills to help working horses. Internationally by campaigning for improved welfare and an end to long distance transport for slaughter
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£16,471,000
Donations and legacies | £15.62m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £591.00k | |
Investments | £154.00k | |
Other | £107.00k |
Total expenditure:
£10,709,000
Raising funds | £2.72m | |
Charitable activities | £7.99m | |
Other | £0 |
£174,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £42,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.72m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.99m | |
Retained for future use | £5.76m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.72m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.99m | |
Retained for future use | £5.94m |
People

125 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambodia
- Chile
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Ireland
- Lesotho
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Panama
- Scotland
- Senegal
- South Africa
Governance
- 25 May 1979: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 19 November 2024: Funds received from 297576 THE SUSSEX HORSE RESCUE TRUST
- 19 November 2024: Funds received from 297576 THE SUSSEX HORSE RESCUE TRUST
- INTERNATIONAL LEAGUE FOR THE PROTECTION OF HORSES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Tolhurst | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lars Breisner | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sheena Claire Emerson-Keeler | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Polly Clare Compston | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Meredith Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
SAIMA HABIB | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Allen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Hugh Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Davies CVO DL | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Melissa Gray-Cheape | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Wynne Tufnell MRCVS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAM BULLARD | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
John Jarvis KC | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Keith Price CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Nokes MP | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.31m | £7.36m | £8.51m | £8.25m | £16.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63m | £8.05m | £8.01m | £9.49m | £10.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.17k | £128.00k | £154.00k | £42.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.31m | £6.56m | £7.71m | £7.42m | £15.62m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £670.00k | £373.00k | £434.00k | £580.00k | £591.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £242.00k | £114.00k | £137.00k | £138.00k | £154.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £93.00k | £306.00k | £232.00k | £117.00k | £107.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.77m | £4.64m | £5.72m | £4.59m | £13.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.09m | £6.77m | £6.82m | £7.60m | £7.99m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.54m | £1.27m | £1.19m | £1.89m | £2.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £231.00k | £170.00k | £183.00k | £165.00k | £129.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £77.00k | £68.00k | £94.00k | £89.13k | £64.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.90m | £13.57m | £13.30m | £13.41m | £14.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.85m | £11.06m | £12.23m | £10.75m | £9.92m | |
|
Other assets | £7.65m | £8.28m | £9.03m | £7.78m | £13.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £478.00k | £1.47m | £1.45m | £778.00k | £835.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 3 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 27 APRIL 1999, 5 MARCH 2008 AND 16 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND REHABILITATION OF EQUINES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORLD HORSE WELFARE
ANNE COLVIN HOUSE
SNETTERTON
NORWICH
NR16 2LR
- Phone:
- 01953497218
- Email:
- info@worldhorsewelfare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window