Accounts and annual returns The Craft Bakers Benevolent and Education Fund

Charity number: 206691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required