THE STAPLEFORD FEOFFEE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inhabitants of the village of Stapleford, or who identify with it. Young people, playgroups, school field events, students going to University, adults in need of aids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 31 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Elizabeth Pett | Chair | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Swinton | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Jane Creed | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Horsley Robinson | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Whitehouse | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alastair Roy MacGregor | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Revd Dr SIMON WHELDON TAYLOR KC | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.86k | £8.91k | £7.95k | £8.73k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £9.99k | £5.02k | £8.71k | £8.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 10TH APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
32. FROM THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY THE COSTS OF MAINTAINING ANY PROPERTY, INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS AND ALL OTHER COSTS OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY. SUCH PAYMENTS SHALL BE MADE BEFORE ANY OTHER PAYMENTS UNDER THE FOLLOWING CLAUSES. 27 33. 33. AFTER THE PAYMENT OF THOSE COSTS OF THE CHARITY, THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY AS FOLLOWS: A. THREE-FIFTHS (3/5TH) TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STAPLEFORD, TO BE APPLIED BY IT IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STAPLEFORD AND THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES IN THE CHURCH, AND SUBJECT TO THAT USE, FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH. B. TWO-FIFTHS (2/5TH) TO BE APPLIED BY WAY OF GRANTS OR LOANS AS SET OUT BELOW. 34. GRANTS OR LOANS MAY BE OF MONEY, OR BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. GRANTS OR LOANS MAY BE MADE TO INDIVIDUALS. ORGANISATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS ARE ELIGIBLE ONLY FOR GRANTS. 35. GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS MAY BE MADE PROVIDED THAT THEY SATISFY BOTH THE GEOGRAPHICAL AND PURPOSE CRITERIA SET OUT IN CLAUSES 36 TO 38 BELOW. 36. THE GEOGRAPHICAL CRITERION IS SATISFIED IF THE PERSON TO WHOM THE GRANT OR LOAN IS PROPOSED TO BE MADE: A. LIVES IN STAPLEFORD EITHER PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY, B. LIVES IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE STAPLEFORD, C. HAS A PRESENT CONNECTION OR ASSOCIATION WITH STAPLEFORD, WHETHER BY REASON OF WORK, SCHOOLING OR OTHERWISE, OR D. HAS A PAST CONNECTION OR ASSOCIATION WITH STAPLEFORD, WHETHER BY REASON OF WORK, SCHOOLING OR OTHERWISE, AND THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THEY OUGHT FOR SUFFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF THEY WERE LIVING IN STAPLEFORD. 37. THE PURPOSE CRITERION IS SATISFIED IF THE PROPOSED GRANT OR LOAN IS FOR: A. THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, B. THE PREVENTION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, OR C. EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OR PURPOSES ANCILLARY TO EDUCATION AND THE GRANT OR LOAN IS INTENDED TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 38. IN ASSESSING NEED: A. IN THE CASE OF GRANTS OR LOANS RELATED TO THE NEEDS OF A CHILD, THE GRANT OR LOAN SHALL BE MADE TO THE CHILD’S PARENT(S) OR CARER(S), AND THE MEANS OF THE CHILD’S PARENTS OR CARERS SHALL BE TAKEN INTO ACCOUNT, AND B. IN THE CASE OF GRANTS OR LOANS RELATED TO THE NEEDS OF AN ADULT, ONLY THE MEANS OF THE ADULT THEMSELVES SHALL BE TAKEN INTO ACCOUNT. 39. GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS MAY BE FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES, AND MAY BE ONE-OFF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS. 40. GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS MAY BE MADE IF THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER THAT THE ORGANISATION’S OR INSTITUTION’S USE OF THE GRANT WOULD SUBSTANTIALLY FULFIL BOTH THE GEOGRAPHICAL AND PURPOSE CRITERIA. 41. THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE, SUBJECT TO THE AVAILABILITY OF FUNDS AND THE COMPETING DEMANDS ON THE CHARITY, TO PAY A RECURRING GRANT TO EITHER AN INDIVIDUAL OR AN ORGANISATION OR INSTITUTION, SAVE THAT IT MAY UNDERTAKE TO DO SO FOR A MAXIMUM PERIOD OF THREE YEARS. ANY SUCH UNDERTAKING MUST BE SUBJECT TO THE AVAILABILITY OF FUNDS, THE COMPETING DEMANDS ON THE CHARITY AND TO REVIEW BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING. TO AVOID ANY DOUBT, SUCH GRANTS MAY SUBSEQUENTLY BE RENEWED ONCE OR MORE THAN ONCE. 42. THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT APPLY ANY PART OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS BUT MAY APPLY INCOME IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STAPLEFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Verger's Cottage
1 Gog Magog Way
Stapleford
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
CB22 5BQ
- Phone:
- 01223 840256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window