ABINGDON DRAMA CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Theatrical performances Educating young people interested in the Theatre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 June 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Crocker | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Jenkins | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Green | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lin Crowley | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wilson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Atkinson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susi Dalton | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Orchard | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Hawkins | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.08k | £10.15k | £4.71k | £19.59k | £19.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.87k | £4.03k | £12.84k | £17.75k | £17.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH NOVEMBER 1959 AS AMENDED 19TH JANUARY 1962 AND 23 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH ART AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION THEREIN.
Area of benefit
ABINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abingdon Drama Club
6 Marcham Road
ABINGDON
OX14 1AA
- Phone:
- 07539906683
- Email:
- abingdondramaclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window