THE READING AND DISTRICT HARD OF HEARING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 206728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Reading Hard of Hearing Club teaches lipreading and gives support to people who suffer from hearing loss.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £1,179
Total expenditure: £1,353

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAUREEN DICKENS Chair 05 September 2011
None on record
Derek John Campbell Chilvers Trustee 01 January 2017
ABBEY BAPTIST CHURCH, READING
Recently registered
Irene Kay Murray Trustee 01 January 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £615 £0 £551 £911 £1.18k
Total expenditure £272 £325 £1.06k £1.22k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 FOXHILL ROAD
READING
RG1 5QR
Phone:
01189268055
Website:

No information available