WOOD GREEN ELDERLY CARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Elderly/old People
- Haringey
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 11 May 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- AGE CONCERN WOOD GREEN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55 | |
|
Total expenditure | £294 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1955 AS AMENDED 26TH MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL RECREATION, AND THROUGH THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND IN ANY OTHER MANNER DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW WITHIN THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WOOD GREEN NOW PART OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT.")
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY (WOOD GREEN)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window