THE NATIONAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF WATCH AND CLOCK MAKERS

Charity number: 206750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The giving of grants to beneficiaries to relieve sickness, disability, infirmity and financial needs of those persons who have been engaged in any branch of the watch and clock trades and their widows or widowers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £62,618
Total expenditure: £285,635

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 11 February 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HOWARD CARL NEWMAN Chair 06 October 2016
GIBSON WALDEN FUND
Received: On time
The Gibson Library Society
Received: On time
Michael Marcus ter Kuile Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Robert Woolgar Wren FBHI Trustee 22 February 2024
THE ANTIQUARIAN HOROLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Camilla Szymanowska Trustee 12 February 2024
COOPERS CHARITY CIO
Received: On time
Patrick Sheehan Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Luke Graham Gleave Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
PAUL ROBERSON Trustee 24 June 2011
BRITISH HOROLOGICAL INSTITUTE EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
ELIZABETH CRANDON GILL Trustee
None on record
VALERIE ADELE LEONARD Trustee
None on record
PAUL FRANK CRADOCK LVO Trustee
None on record
ROBERT ANDREW BALL LVO FBHI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £102.56k £80.34k £75.88k £68.22k £62.62k
Total expenditure £268.53k £283.53k £275.65k £318.69k £285.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 18 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 18 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 18 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED DATED 27 JUNE 1855.
Charitable objects
BUILDINGS FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 11 February 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Crossing Gate
Brambletye Lane
FOREST ROW
England
RH18 5EH
Phone:
07590673598