CHARITY OF THOMAS HENWOOD

Charity Number: 206765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

distributes monies to sick elderly and needy of Gunwalloe

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,807
Total expenditure: £7,394

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE HENWOOD TRUST (Working name)
  • THOMAS HENWOOD TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Elizabeth Worden Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Alan Matthew Worden Trustee 23 August 2019
None on record
Deborah Lynn Pollard Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN THORNTON MILLS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.47k £6.85k £10.94k £11.81k £11.81k
Total expenditure £18.44k £7.31k £9.12k £5.03k £7.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Westward Ho
Gunwalloe
HELSTON
Cornwall
TR12 7QG
Phone:
07890782561
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available