Trustees ROBERT COCKS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 206796
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Terri Hammond Trustee 28 November 2023
FRIENDS OF OLD BUCKENHAM WINDMILL
Received: On time
ROBERT COCKS ALMSHOUSE CIO
Recently registered
Lesley Gowers Trustee 01 September 2023
ROBERT COCKS ALMSHOUSE CIO
Recently registered
Stephen Thorley Trustee 06 December 2022
ROBERT COCKS ALMSHOUSE CIO
Recently registered
Pauline Margaret Dixon Trustee 14 December 2021
None on record
MARTIN HALL Trustee 28 November 2013
ROBERT COCKS ALMSHOUSE CIO
Recently registered