ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH

Charity number: 206799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Objectives are to promote the work and objectives of the Society. To promote kindness and to prevent or suppress cruelty to animals by all lawful means.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 08 March 2022: Funds received from 207972 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
  • 14 May 2024: Funds received from 210634 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Mid & North Essex Branch (Working name)
  • Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals North West Essex Branch (Working name)
  • RSPCA ESSEX NORTH EAST BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA NORTH ESSEX BRANCH (Working name)
  • The Incorporated Trustees of the Charity of the Royal Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Essex Mid & North Branch (Working name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX NORTH EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH ESSEX BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA ESSEX NORTH EAST BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Elizabeth Jubb Chair 16 September 2020
STISTED VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rachel Louise Skillen Trustee 12 August 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Stephen Robert Cook Trustee 30 May 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Brigitte Swanton Trustee 04 January 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Dr Susan Margaret North Trustee 13 October 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Fiona Lawes Trustee 01 March 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ESSEX MID & NORTH BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £411.95k £519.45k £899.29k £816.23k £1.20m
Total expenditure £411.65k £527.39k £867.17k £840.78k £881.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £65.19k £94.65k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £219.96k £110.25k £168.85k £466.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £167.01k £272.28k £449.34k £468.83k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £126.95k £204.14k £192.87k £246.06k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5.54k £5.42k £5.17k £14.37k
Income - Other N/A £0 £307.20k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £179.51k £6.00k £68.48k £344.65k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £341.88k £478.16k £425.87k £502.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £185.51k £389.02k £414.91k £379.67k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.33k £17.72k £16.57k £26.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A £260.76k £196.68k £198.23k £360.36k
Long-term investments N/A £129.77k £149.86k £141.95k £141.94k
Other assets N/A £402.10k £449.71k £482.32k £566.58k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £44.74k £62.23k £120.95k £53.46k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
116 HARWICH ROAD
COLCHESTER
ESSEX
CO4 3BZ
Phone:
0300 323 0403