SIR JAMES MARTIN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grants to distressed individuals and charitable organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1962: Standard registration
- 27 October 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | £1.54k | £1.65k | £1.26k | £838 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £2.21k | £931 | £1.27k | £4.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 11 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 20 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 29 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS CHARITIES AND OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window