PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE'S FUND
Charity Number: 246749-2
Removed charity
Charity overview
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 1956, AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 17 NOVEMBER 1959 AND 26 OCTOBER 1981.
Charitable objects
FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF ANY OF THE REGULAR UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT OR ANY OF THE UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY; PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SOR FAR AS THE INCOME OF ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID, THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME:- (I) IN ASSISTING PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE REGIMENT (AND ESPECIALLY IN THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION THEREOF) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE; (II) IN PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS OR MAKING DONATIONS TO HOSPITALS, HOMES AND INSTITUTIONS HAVING AMONGST THEIR OBJECTS THE SUCCOUR IN SICKNESS OR CONVALESCENCE OF OFFICERS OR MEN WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 09 February 1966: Standard registration
- 19 August 1997: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 19 August 1997: Funds transferred to 246902 THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT WELFARE FUND
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.