Accounts and annual returns JANE GOODMAN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 November 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 July 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required