Financial history THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR PARASITOLOGY

Charity number: 206847
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £107.63k £171.77k £106.73k £278.75k £171.45k
Total expenditure £106.57k £134.71k £133.42k £272.09k £169.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0