SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCI aims to advance the science of applied chemistry sciences for the public good by: furthering the application of scientific discoveries to the products and processes of industry; providing a forum in which discussions on the opportunities and issues of industry can take place, and publishing journals and books; granting medals, scholarships and other awards; all such other charitable means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,840,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.76m | |
Other trading activities | £776.00k | |
Investments | £272.00k | |
Other | £30.00k |
Total expenditure:
£3,862,000
Raising funds | £220.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.64m | |
Other | £0 |
£648,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £220.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.64m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £220.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.64m | |
Retained for future use | £626.00k |
People

34 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- S C I (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greg Clark Rt Hon | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ana Perroni Laloe | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Birk | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victor Christou | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Curtis | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Compton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH ROWSELL | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoff Mackey | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeremy Parker | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Waterhouse | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharali Malik | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacqueline Sheridan | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEVIN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH SKERRATT | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr BEN ALSTON | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN HAGUE | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVE ALLEN | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIFFANY WOOD | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFFREY FOWLER | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.56m | £2.87m | £2.59m | £2.92m | £3.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.70m | £3.12m | £2.96m | £3.23m | £3.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £78.32k | £22.29k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.00k | £324 | £324 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £692.00k | £407.90k | £284.40k | £540.00k | £776.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.69m | £2.18m | £2.01m | £2.13m | £2.76m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £171.00k | £190.85k | £225.04k | £235.00k | £272.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £4.00k | £11.09k | £52.10k | £16.00k | £30.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.44m | £3.03m | £2.87m | £3.07m | £3.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £262.00k | £87.47k | £93.36k | £161.00k | £220.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.00k | £40.09k | £31.02k | £26.00k | £52.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £76.86k | £109.14k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £33.00k | £32.09k | £32.09k | £161.00k | £33.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.60m | £4.42m | £4.39m | £4.22m | £4.03m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.43m | £7.58m | £8.43m | £7.18m | £7.79m | |
|
Other assets | £2.55m | £2.84m | £2.39m | £2.38m | £2.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £821.00k | £926.13k | £765.57k | £860.00k | £1.14m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 17 JUN 1907 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 1986 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 1991 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 13 JUN 2007 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 14 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 21 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF APPLIED CHEMISTRY AND RELATED SCIENCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- ARTHUR JOHN BANKS
- BAEKELAND LECTURE FUND
- BROTHERTON MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- CASTNER MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- CHANCE MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- CHARLES TENNANT MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- DUNN MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- FOOD GROUP INTERNATIONAL LECTURESHIP FUND
- HENRY E ARMSTRONG ENDOWED MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- HURTER MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- IVAN LEVINSTEIN MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- JOHN GRAY JUBILEE SCHOLARSHIP
- LISTER MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- MISS ETHEL BEHRENS
- OILS AND FATS GROUP INTERNATIONAL LECTURESHIP FUND
- OILS AND FATS GROUP INTERNATIONAL LECTURESHIP FUND
- ROBERT HORNE ENDOWED LECTURE FUND
- RUDOLPH MESSEL
- THE COMMEMORATION FUND
- THE LEVERHULME PRIZE FUND
- THE LEVERHULME PRIZE FUND
- THE SELIGMAN APV TRUST
- VISCOUNT LEVERHULME MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY
14-15 BELGRAVE SQUARE
LONDON
SW1X 8PS
- Phone:
- 02075981511
- Email:
- accounts@soci.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window