EAST SUFFOLK ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is a local charity promoting the welfare of blind and partially sighted people in East Suffolk. ESAB's primary goal is to help visually impaired people maintain their quality of life and independence in their own homes, through the support of Community Workers who visit them in their homes. In addition, there are seven District Social Groups who meet monthly acroos the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1986: Standard registration
- 06 November 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1173918 EAST SUFFOLK ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND
- EAST SUFFOLK BLIND (Working name)
- EAST SUFFOLK COUNTY ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.29k | £103.28k | £168.09k | £92.77k | £81.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.26k | £114.09k | £109.25k | £103.55k | £108.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 06 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FORMED 1914. CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1947 AS AMENDED 4TH JUNE 1986, 5TH JUNE 1989, 13TH MAY 1991, 6TH JULY 1992, 1 JULY 1996, 31 JULY 2006, AND 30 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY-SIGHTED PEOPLE IN THE AREA COVERED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES AS APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
EAST SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window