Trustees ROYAL HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 206888

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Lucy Noakes | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Karen Louise Harvey | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Clare Feely | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jesus Sanjurjo-Ramos | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthias Neumann | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Mark James Knights | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Iftikhar Haider Malik | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clare Victoria Joanne Griffiths | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Budd | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Marie Bradley | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Olwen Ruth Purdue | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Julia Paul | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Emilie Murphy | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caitriona Beaumont | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Lee | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melissa Calaresu | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barbara Bombi | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.