AGE CONCERN - HAILSHAM, HELLINGLY AND HERSTMONCEUX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
social club for the over 55's offering entertainment. Home made 2 course lunches on week days We also offer nail cutting, chiropody, hearing aid batteries service , charity shop
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1000 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- AGE CONCERN - HAILSHAM AND HELLINGLY (Previous name)
- HAILSHAM AND HELLINGLY AGE CONCERN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN FAULKNER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fran Faulkner | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Blackwell | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Stanton | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rowe | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Mullen | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.17k | £27.67k | £34.50k | £53.56k | £58.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.85k | £28.91k | £44.24k | £53.09k | £65.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1956 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 1989, 19 MAY 1994, 16 MARCH 1995, 12TH NOVEMBER 1996 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE TOWN OF HAILSHAM AND THE PARISHES OF HELLINGLY AND HERSTMONCEUX.
Area of benefit
HAILSHAM AND HELLINGLY AND HERSTMONCEUX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pastures
Lower Horsebridge
Hailsham
East Sussex
BN27 4DN
- Phone:
- 07453411147
- Email:
- sally@chcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window