Trustees HIGH POLYMER RESEARCH GROUP
Charity number: 206902
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Dame Athene Donald | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Lorna Dougan | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Richard Anthony Lewis Jones | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Neal St John Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Richard Lloyd Anderson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Cameron Alexander | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Matthew Gibson | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor R K O'Reilly | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Jerry Winter | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
DR ANDREW BURGESS | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Eva Malmstrom Jonsson | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Gareth Crapper | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.