THE SIR WILLIAM COXEN TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The balance of the income to be applied for the benefit of all or any of the Orthopaedic Hospitals of England or other hospitals or charitable institutions carrying out similar work (preference should be given to the Royal National Orthopaedic Hospital of Great Portland Street, London).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alderman Simon Tony Pryke | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Gregory Jones KC | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Makin | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
NIcholas Lyons | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sir Andrew Charles Parmley KStJ | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Alderman Bronek Masojada | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.72k | £89.57k | £98.75k | £106.75k | £124.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.30k | £72.14k | £175.54k | £33.74k | £36.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1940. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITALS OF ENGLAND AND OTHER HOSPITALS OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS CARRYING AT SIMILAR WORK.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORPORATION OF LONDON
PO BOX 270
LONDON
EC2P 2EJ
- Phone:
- 02073321409
- Email:
- Grants@cityoflondon.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window