SAMUEL WILSON'S LOAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BENEFIT YOUNG PERSONS RECENTLY SET UP IN BUSINESS BY GRANTING LOANS AT A LOW RATE OF INTEREST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Buckinghamshire
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 24 May 2022: Funds received from 1171764 THOMAS ARNEWAY'S LOAN CHARITY
- SAMUEL WILSON'S LOAN TRUST (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
caroline AL-BEYERTY | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALDERMAN PREM GOYAL | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALDERMAN ROBERT CHARLES HUGHES-PENNEY | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALDERMAN ALISON GOWMAN | Trustee | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alastair King | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|||||
VINCENT KEAVENY | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.48k | £104.55k | £135.31k | £145.02k | £90.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.44k | £31.61k | £4.08k | £200.75k | £151.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10TH MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1998 AND 4 MARCH 2011 AND AN ORDER DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2005. as amended on 13 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; A) THE PROVISION OF LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND COMPANIES PREPARING FOR OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, MANUFACTURE, BUSINESS OR PROFESSION IN THE AREA COMPRISING GREATER LONDON AND THE COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, KENT, SURREY, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX; B) INVESTING IN SHARES OF COMPANIES PREPARING FOR OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, MANUFACTURE, BUSINESS OR PROFESSION IN THE AREA COMPRISING GREATER LONDON AND THE COUNTIES OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, ESSEX, HERTFORDSHIRE, KENT, SURREY, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAMBER OF LONDON
PO BOX 270
GUILDHALL
LONDON
EC2P 2EJ
- Phone:
- 02073321350
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window