Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF WILLIAM BEVAN

Charity number: 207015
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2004 09 November 2005 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required