THE SUSSEX ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a membership organisation for those interested in the history and archaeology of Sussex. We open six historic properties to the visiting public. Each property has its own museum and provides education services for children. We are a research organisation and carry out our own excavations as well as providing support and advice for other local researchers in both history and archaeology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,503,048
Donations and legacies | £117.03k | |
Charitable activities | £998.60k | |
Other trading activities | £364.29k | |
Investments | £23.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,950,821
Raising funds | £358.80k | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other | £496.30k |
£15,103 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £855.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m |
People

72 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 May 1962: Standard registration
- 24 July 2003: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SUSSEX PAST (Working name)
- SUSSEX ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jones | Chair | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PORTIA TREMLETT | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARGARET SANDERSON | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA KENT | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES LA ROOY | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ORNA-ORNSTEIN | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Paul Basu | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Glynn Jones | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Joseph Adam Bates | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH VICTORIA WATSON | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Ian Pope PhD FSA | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97m | £2.58m | £1.93m | £1.61m | £1.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.22m | £1.88m | £1.94m | £2.10m | £1.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £513.63k | £30.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £332.44k | £1.19m | £154.11k | £252.71k | £117.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £607.10k | £111.25k | £346.33k | £381.25k | £364.29k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £966.63k | £1.25m | £1.39m | £964.74k | £998.60k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £68.38k | £29.62k | £38.04k | £16.20k | £23.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £500.10k | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.74m | £1.62m | £1.60m | £1.68m | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £480.41k | £257.39k | £342.23k | £424.19k | £358.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.50k | £16.24k | £19.90k | £89.50k | £17.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £204 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £496.30k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.28m | £1.81m | £1.40m | £1.33m | £1.30m | |
|
Long-term investments | £898.18k | £156.67k | £618.28k | £660.96k | £581.63k | |
|
Other assets | £194.36k | £1.19m | £1.10m | £602.57k | £287.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £171.46k | £244.31k | £236.74k | £206.73k | £219.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JANUARY 1925 AND AMENDED 6 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY HAS BEEN ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES (‘OBJECTS’): 1. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF ARCHAEOLOGY BY ENCOURAGING ALL PEOPLE FROM LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN, ENGAGE, STUDY AND RESEARCH THE ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX; AND/OR 2. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN MUSEUMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MANAGING, MAINTAINING, LEASING, ACCEPTING AS A GIFT OR LEGACY AND MAKING ACCESSIBLE MUSEUMS AND HISTORIC SITES, MONUMENTS, COLLECTIONS AND PROPERTIES IN THE COUNTIES OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX; AND/OR 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING LIFE-LONG LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY, BOTH AT THE SOCIETY’S PROPERTIES AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SUSSEX
Linked charities
- 30 May 1962 : Standard registration
- 24 July 2003 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barbican House
169 High Street
Lewes
East Sussex
BN7 1YE
- Phone:
- 01273486260
- Email:
- adminlewes@sussexpast.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window