JOHN BENN BOYS HOSTELS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 25 August 1972: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 29TH OCTOBER 1926 AS AMENDED ON THE 11TH JANUARY 1937, THE 23RD MAY 1949 AND THE 28TH MARCH 1950
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH IN STEPNEY A HOSTEL FOR BOYS BELONGING TO THE POORER CLASSES AND LIVING OR WORKING IN EAST LONDON AND A HALL OR CENTRE FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AND FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN DISTRESS AND THE PREVENTION OF POVERTY. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
LONDON AND OTHER GREAT CITIES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.