WEST MALLING RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make small cash donations to people in need within the permitted area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
Governance
- 21 December 1979: Standard registration
- 01 December 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244 | |
|
Total expenditure | £155 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 22 December 2008 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 DECEMBER 1979.
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WEST MALLING WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. ONE-EIGHTH OF THE YEARLY INCOME SHALL BE GIVEN TO PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
WEST MALLING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window