Trustees WINTERTON (NORFOLK) TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 207082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Child Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Paul Michael Lubbock Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Julia Caroline Wacey Trustee 26 October 2021
None on record
VALERIE SANDRA BLAKE Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Lynda Margaret Sheppey Trustee 20 January 2015
None on record
JANE ELIZABETH ROBERTS Trustee 16 November 2011
None on record