THE A F WALLACE CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are mainly the provision of housing, welfare and pension facilities for senior citizens who have been associated with the Wallace family and to assist wherever possible with general good causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE FALCONER WALLACE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT CHARLES WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FALCONER ALEXANDER WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.17k | £36.06k | £40.56k | £43.57k | £38.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.25k | £43.73k | £39.35k | £50.26k | £46.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 25TH AUGUST 1912, AND DEEDS POOL DATED 21ST APRIL 1914, 1ST APRIL 1916
Charitable objects
FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cedars
The Dene
Hurstbourne Tarrant
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP11 0AG
- Phone:
- 07799475948
- Email:
- val@buzzards.accountant
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window